Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Pedro de Moya y Contreras

Deceased

Archbishop of México, Federal District

Patriarch of West Indies


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1530¹Born
17 Jun 157343.4AppointedArchbishop of México, Federal District
21 Nov 157343.8Ordained BishopArchbishop of México, Federal District
15 Jan 159161.0AppointedPatriarch of West Indies, Spain
7 Dec 159161.9DiedArchbishop of México, Federal District

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Pedro de Moya y Contreras (VIAF: 52489475)
Archbishop Pedro de Moya y Contreras (born 1530, died ) Archbishop of México

EventPlace
Birth PlacePedroche, Diocese of Córdoba, Spain
Ordained BishopPuebla, Diocese of Tlaxcala (Puebla de los Angeles)
Death PlaceMadrid, Archdiocese of Toledo, Spain

  • a bishop for 18.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 140, Number 12,392
  • b/c2: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1500, Page 84, Number 505
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 243, and Page 213
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1573, Number 12

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.7, 12 Sep 2017; Data: 8 Nov 2017