Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Franciszek Kanigowski

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Włocławek (Kujawy, Kalisze)

Titular Bishop of Torone


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
5 Oct 1686³BornGlinociz
25 Mar 171124.4Ordained DeaconDeacon
4 Apr 171124.4Ordained PriestPriest
11 Nov 174054.0AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Włocławek (Kujawy, Kalisze), Poland
11 Nov 174054.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Torone
1741¹54.2Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Torone
27 May 175972.6DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Włocławek (Kujawy, Kalisze), Poland

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Franciszek Kanigowski:
Bishop Franciszek Kanigowski (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Włocławek (Kujawy, Kalisze)

  • a priest for 48.1 years
  • a bishop for 18.4 years

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 411, and Page 454
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1741, Number 69

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 11 Nov 2015