Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Patriarch Aloysius Foscari

Deceased

Patriarch of Venezia {Venice}, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
2 Oct 1679Born
22 Apr 172545.5Ordained PriestPriest of Venezia {Venice}, Italy
3 Jul 174161.7AppointedPatriarch of Venezia {Venice}, Italy
10 Sep 174161.9Ordained BishopPatriarch of Venezia {Venice}, Italy
28 Oct 175879.0DiedPatriarch of Venezia {Venice}, Italy

MicroData Summary for Aloysius Foscari
Patriarch Aloysius Foscari (born , died ) Patriarch of Venezia {Venice}

EventPlace
Birth PlaceVenezia

  • a priest for 33.5 years
  • a bishop for 17.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1741, Number 50
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 436

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast