Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Filippo Neri degli Altoviti

Deceased

Bishop of Fiesole


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
10 Sep 1634BornFlorence
30 Jan 166126.3Ordained PriestPriest
27 May 167540.7AppointedBishop of Fiesole, Italy
3 Jun 167540.7Ordained BishopBishop of Fiesole, Italy
28 Nov 170268.2DiedBishop of Fiesole, Italy

MicroData Summary for Filippo Neri degli Altoviti:
Bishop Filippo Neri degli Altoviti (born , died ) Bishop of Fiesole

  • a priest for 41.8 years
  • a bishop for 27.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 201
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1675, Number 10

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 11 Nov 2015