Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Tommaso Vidoni

Deceased

Apostolic Nuncio Emeritus to Florence (Tuscany), Italy

Titular Archbishop of Edessa in OsrhoŽne


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1650¹Born
27 Sep 169040.7AppointedTitular Archbishop of Edessa in OsrhoŽne
5 Oct 169040.7AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Florence (Tuscany), Italy
25 Mar 169141.2Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Edessa in OsrhoŽne
Dec 1697³47.9ResignedApostolic Nuncio to Florence (Tuscany), Italy
29 Oct 170858.8DiedApostolic Nuncio Emeritus to Florence (Tuscany), Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Tommaso Vidoni
Archbishop Tommaso Vidoni (born 1650, died ) Apostolic Nuncio Emeritus of Florence (Tuscany)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCremona, Diocese of Cremona
Ordained BishopEpiscopal Palace, Chapel, Firenze, Archdiocese of Firenze {Florence}
Death PlaceRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

  • a bishop for 17.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 191
  • b: Les Ordinations …piscopales, Year 1690, Number 46
  • nunc: Les Nonciatures Apostoliques Permanentes (Karttunen), Page 267
  • b/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 232, Number 19,404

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 10 Jul 2017