Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Cesar Crescenzio de Angelis

Deceased

Bishop of Segni


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
30 Jun 1705³BornTorrice
6 Jun 173428.9Ordained PriestPriest
15 Dec 175550.4AppointedBishop of Segni, Italy
21 Dec 175550.4Ordained BishopBishop of Segni, Italy
10 Sep 176560.1DiedBishop of Segni, Italy

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Cesar Crescenzio de Angelis:
Bishop Cesar Crescenzio de Angelis (born , died ) Bishop of Segni

  • a priest for 31.2 years
  • a bishop for 9.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 380
  • c34: CB, 13 May 2013
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations …piscopales, Year 1755, Number 41

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.1.0, 17 Nov 2015; Data: 23 Nov 2015