Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jean Daffis

Deceased

Bishop of Lombez, France


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1604¹Born
31 Dec 162622.9SelectedBishop of Lombez, France
21 Aug 162824.6ConfirmedBishop of Lombez, France
11 Nov 162824.8Ordained PriestPriest
12 Nov 162824.8Ordained BishopBishop of Lombez, France
16 Nov 165753.8DiedBishop of Lombez, France

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Jean Daffis
Bishop Jean Daffis (born 1604, died ) Bishop of Lombez

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBordeaux

  • a priest for 29.0 years
  • a bishop for 29.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 223
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1628, Number 18

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018