Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Bernardino Fumarelli

Deceased

Bishop of Valva e Sulmona, Italy


Events

DateEventTitle
7 Aug 1528AppointedBishop of Minervino Murge, Italy
16 Aug 1529AppointedBishop of Alife, Italy
8 Sep 1529Ordained BishopBishop of Alife, Italy
13 Nov 1532AppointedBishop of Valva e Sulmona, Italy
5 Jun 1547DiedBishop of Valva e Sulmona, Italy

MicroData Summary for Bernardino Fumarelli
Bishop Bernardino Fumarelli (died ) Bishop of Valva e Sulmona

EventPlace
Ordained BishopSacriste des XII Apotres, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

  • a bishop for 17.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 326, and Page 104
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 245
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1529, Number 23

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 29 Jun 2018

Quantcast