Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Alessandro Croce

Deceased

Bishop of Cremona


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
3 Jul 1650BornMediolanen
19 Sep 167626.2Ordained PriestPriest
2 Dec 169747.4AppointedBishop of Cremona, Italy
8 Dec 169747.4Ordained BishopBishop of Cremona, Italy
23 Sep 170454.2DiedBishop of Cremona, Italy

MicroData Summary for Alessandro Croce:
Bishop Alessandro Croce (born , died ) Bishop of Cremona

  • a priest for 28.0 years
  • a bishop for 6.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 5, Page 176
  • c34: CB, 13 May 2013

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013