Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Charles-François Couton (Cantoni)

Deceased

Bishop of Nice


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 Apr 1687BornRonco
15 Mar 171022.9Ordained PriestPriest
22 Feb 174153.9SelectedBishop of Nice, France
17 Apr 174154.0ConfirmedBishop of Nice, France
23 Apr 174154.0Ordained BishopBishop of Nice, France
23 Aug 176376.4DiedBishop of Nice, France

MicroData Summary for Charles-François Couton (Cantoni):
Bishop Charles-François Couton (Cantoni) (born , died ) Bishop of Nice

  • a priest for 53.4 years
  • a bishop for 22.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi
  • c34: CB, 12 May 2013

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013