Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Gérard de Courtonne

Deceased

Bishop of Soissons, France


Events

DateEventTitle
27 Aug 1313AppointedBishop of Soissons, France
1 Dec 1314Ordained BishopBishop of Soissons, France
27 Oct 1331DiedBishop of Soissons, France

MicroData Summary for Gérard de Courtonne
Bishop Gérard de Courtonne (died ) Bishop of Soissons

  • a bishop for 16.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 468
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 42, Number 2,732

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast