Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Egide (Gilles) Aycelini

Deceased

Archbishop of Rouen, France


Events

DateEventTitle
25 Nov 1290AppointedArchbishop of Narbonne, France
17 Mar 1291Ordained BishopArchbishop of Narbonne, France
5 May 1311AppointedArchbishop of Rouen, France
24 Jun 1318DiedArchbishop of Rouen, France

MicroData Summary for Egide (Gilles) Aycelini
Archbishop Egide (Gilles) Aycelini (died ) Archbishop of Rouen

  • a bishop for 27.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 356, and Page 425
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 105, Number 9,101
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 42, Number 2,727

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.9, 13 Apr 2020; Data: 1 Jun 2020

Quantcast