Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Roberto Costaguti

Deceased

Bishop of Sansepolcro (Borgo San Sepolcro)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 Jun 1732BornLivorno
21 Dec 175422.5Ordained PriestPriest
14 Dec 177846.5AppointedBishop of Sansepolcro (Borgo San Sepolcro), Italy
20 Dec 177846.5Ordained BishopBishop of Sansepolcro (Borgo San Sepolcro), Italy
16 Nov 181886.4DiedBishop of Sansepolcro (Borgo San Sepolcro), Italy

MicroData Summary for Roberto Costaguti:
Bishop Roberto Costaguti (born , died ) Bishop of Sansepolcro (Borgo San Sepolcro)

  • a priest for 63.9 years
  • a bishop for 39.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 6, Page 135

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013