Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Antonio Cardinal Correr, C.R.S.A. †

Deceased

Cardinal-Bishop of Ostia (e Velletri)

Titular See: (Can. Reg. of Saint Augustine of S. Giorgio in Alga)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 Jul 1359BornVenice
1405¹45.5SelectedBishop of Modon (Medone), Greece
24 Feb 140747.6ConfirmedBishop of Modon (Medone), Greece
26 Feb 140747.6Ordained BishopBishop of Modon (Medone), Greece
31 Mar 140747.7AppointedBishop of Bologna, Italy
9 May 140848.8AppointedCardinal-Priest of San Pietro in Vincoli
9 May 140848.8Elevated to Cardinal
9 May 140949.8AppointedCardinal-Bishop of Porto e Santa Rufina
25 Apr 142060.8AppointedAdministrator of Novigrad (Cittanova), Croatia
20 Feb 142161.6ResignedAdministrator of Novigrad (Cittanova), Croatia
14 Mar 143171.7AppointedCardinal-Bishop of Ostia (e Velletri)
10 Oct 143576.2AppointedAdministrator of Rimini, Italy
Nov 1435³76.3AppointedAdministrator of Cervia, Italy
21 Nov 143576.3ResignedAdministrator of Rimini, Italy
1440²80.5ResignedAdministrator of Cervia, Italy
19 Jan 144585.5DiedCardinal-Bishop of Ostia (e Velletri)

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ² Month Uncertain ; ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Antonio Correr:
Antonio Cardinal Correr C.R.S.A. (born , died ) Cardinal-Bishop of Ostia (e Velletri)

  • a bishop for 37.9 years
  • a cardinal for 36.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 1, Page 352, and Page 141
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 105, Number 9,114
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 9 May 1408
  • c34: CB, 16 Jul 2014

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.8, 8 Mar 2014; data: 17 Jul 2014