Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Agostino da Lanzano

Deceased

Bishop of Spoleto


Events

DateEventTitle
14 Feb 1380AppointedBishop of Penne e Atri, Italy
29 Oct 1390AppointedBishop of Perugia, Italy
27 Feb 1404AppointedBishop of Spoleto, Italy
1410²DiedBishop of Spoleto, Italy

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Agostino da Lanzano:
Bishop Agostino da Lanzano , Bishop of Spoleto

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 1, Page 461, and Page 396
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 1, Page 394

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.8, 8 Mar 2014; data: 17 Jul 2014