Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Francisco Gómez de Mendiola y Solórzano

Deceased

Bishop of Guadalajara, Jalisco, México


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
19 Jan 1519Born
19 Apr 157455.2AppointedBishop of Guadalajara, Jalisco, México
12 Dec 157455.8Ordained BishopBishop of Guadalajara, Jalisco, México
23 Apr 157657.2DiedBishop of Guadalajara, Jalisco, México

MicroData Summary for Francisco Gómez de Mendiola y Solórzano (VIAF: 66226590)
Bishop Francisco Gómez de Mendiola y Solórzano (born , died ) Bishop of Guadalajara

EventPlace
Birth PlaceDurango, Spain
Ordained Bishop
Death PlaceZacatecas

  • a bishop for 1.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 175, Number 14,558
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 195, Number 15,822
  • b: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1500, Page 85, Number 514
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 206
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1574, Number 23

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast