Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giuseppe Stanislao Concas

Deceased

Bishop of Bosa


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
7 Sep 1717³BornSinnai
7 Mar 175941.5SelectedBishop of Bosa, Italy
3 Sep 175941.9ConfirmedBishop of Bosa, Italy
25 Nov 175942.2Ordained BishopBishop of Bosa, Italy
14 Jan 176345.3DiedBishop of Bosa, Italy

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Giuseppe Stanislao Concas:
Bishop Giuseppe Stanislao Concas (born , died ) Bishop of Bosa

  • a bishop for 3.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1763
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 127
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1759, Number 39

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.1.0, 17 Nov 2015; Data: 23 Nov 2015