Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Jean de Bertrandis

Deceased

Archbishop of Tarentaise (Moûtiers-en-Tarentaise), France


Events

DateEventTitle
6 May 1341AppointedBishop of Lausanne, Switzerland
10 Jun 1341Ordained BishopBishop of Lausanne, Switzerland
20 Nov 1342AppointedArchbishop of Tarentaise (Moûtiers-en-Tarentaise), France
Mar 1365³DiedArchbishop of Tarentaise (Moûtiers-en-Tarentaise), France

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Jean de Bertrandis
Archbishop Jean de Bertrandis (died Mar 1365) Archbishop of Tarentaise (Moûtiers-en-Tarentaise)

EventPlace
Ordained BishopAvignon, Diocese of Avignon

  • a bishop for 23.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 297, and Page 472
  • b/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Number 10,289

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.7, 12 Sep 2017; Data: 10 Oct 2017