Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Arnaud de Fabricis, O.P. †

Deceased

Bishop of Aleria, France


Events

DateEventTitle
30 Oct 1333AppointedBishop of Segni, Italy
30 Nov 1333Ordained BishopBishop of Segni, Italy
13 Jul 1345AppointedBishop of Aleria, France
1350¹DiedBishop of Aleria, France

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Arnaud de Fabricis
Bishop Arnaud de Fabricis O.P. (died 1350) Bishop of Aleria

EventPlace
Ordained BishopAvignon, Diocese of Avignon

  • a bishop for 16.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 451, and Page 82
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 116, Number 10,263

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2019
Code: web_b, v3.2.4, 3 Mar 2019; Data: 19 Sep 2019

Quantcast