Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Muzio Colonna

Deceased

Bishop of Marsi, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 Aug 1596Born
17 Sep 162933.0AppointedBishop of Marsi, Italy
13 Dec 162933.3Ordained BishopBishop of Marsi, Italy
5 Sep 163236.0DiedBishop of Marsi, Italy

MicroData Summary for Muzio Colonna
Bishop Muzio Colonna (born , died ) Bishop of Marsi

EventPlace
Birth PlaceRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}
Ordained BishopSan Silvestro di Monte Cavallo, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

  • a bishop for 2.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 232
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1629, Number 25
  • ob/c2+: AT, 13 Sep 2016
  • b/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 229, Number 18,987

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast