Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giovanni Andrea Candido, O.S.Io.Hieros. †

Deceased

Bishop of Gerace


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
2 Nov 1513BornSiracusa
19 Mar 155238.3AppointedBishop of Gerace, Italy
Jun 1552³38.5Ordained BishopBishop of Gerace, Italy
6 Sep 157460.8DiedBishop of Gerace, Italy

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Giovanni Andrea Candido:
Bishop Giovanni Andrea Candido O.S.Io.Hieros. (born , died ) Bishop of Gerace

  • a bishop for 22.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 209
  • bp/bd/ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 136
  • ob/c2: CB, 18 Jul 2014

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015