Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giovanni Battista Civalli, O.F.M. Conv. †

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Olomouc (Olmütz), Czech Republic

Titular Bishop of Nicopolis in Palaestina


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1597²Born
28 Jan 160811.0AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Olomouc (Olmütz), Czech Republic
28 Jan 160811.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Nicopolis in Palaestina
10 Aug 160811.6Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Nicopolis in Palaestina
29 Jan 161720.0DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Olomouc (Olmütz), Czech Republic

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Giovanni Battista Civalli
Bishop Giovanni Battista Civalli O.F.M. Conv. (born 1597, died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Olomouc (Olmütz)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSan Gennesio

  • a bishop for 8.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 205, Number 16,892
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1608, Number 11
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 259

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 28 May 2018

Quantcast