Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Paolo Ciotti

Deceased

Bishop of Segni, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
29 Jun 1736Born
22 Sep 175923.2Ordained PriestPriest
20 Sep 178448.2AppointedBishop of Segni, Italy
21 Sep 178448.2Ordained BishopBishop of Segni, Italy
18 Apr 181982.8DiedBishop of Segni, Italy

MicroData Summary for Paolo Ciotti
Bishop Paolo Ciotti (born , died ) Bishop of Segni

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCitta di Castello

  • a priest for 59.5 years
  • a bishop for 34.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 380
  • d: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 346
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1784, Number 25

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast