Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Esteban de Esmir

Deceased

Bishop of Huesca, Spain


Events

DateEventTitle
11 Apr 1639AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Huesca, Spain
11 Apr 1639AppointedTitular Bishop of Castoria
19 Jun 1639Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Castoria
1 Jan 1641SucceededBishop of Huesca, Spain
21 Feb 1654DiedBishop of Huesca, Spain

MicroData Summary for Esteban de Esmir
Bishop Esteban de Esmir (died ) Bishop of Huesca

EventPlace
Birth PlaceGraus

  • a bishop for 14.6 years

Source(s):
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 132, Number 11,850
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 139, and Page 266
  • b: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1,500, Page 166, Number 1,043
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1639, Number 36

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast