Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Josip Galjuf (Gallyuff)

Deceased

Bishop of Zagreb (Agram), Croatia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
22 Jan 1722³Born
10 Aug 174422.5Ordained DeaconDeacon
15 Aug 174422.5Ordained PriestPriest
22 Mar 177250.1SelectedBishop of Zagreb (Agram), Croatia
14 Dec 177250.8ConfirmedBishop of Zagreb (Agram), Croatia
14 Feb 177351.0Ordained BishopBishop of Zagreb (Agram), Croatia
3 Feb 178664.0DiedBishop of Zagreb (Agram), Croatia

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Josip Galjuf (Gallyuff)
Bishop Josip Galjuf (Gallyuff) (born , died ) Bishop of Zagreb (Agram)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceThuhelien

  • a priest for 41.4 years
  • a bishop for 12.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 448
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1,773, Number 3

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast