Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Pietro Guglielmo de Rocha

Deceased

Archbishop of Salerno, Italy


Events

DateEventTitle
30 Aug 1471AppointedArchbishop of Salerno, Italy
29 Sep 1471Ordained BishopArchbishop of Salerno, Italy
18 Oct 1482DiedArchbishop of Salerno, Italy

MicroData Summary for Pietro Guglielmo de Rocha
Archbishop Pietro Guglielmo de Rocha (died ) Archbishop of Salerno

EventPlace
Ordained BishopS. Eusebe, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

  • a bishop for 11.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 2, Page 227
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 118, Number 10,519
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1500, Page 309, Number 196
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1471, Number 7

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.2.2, 14 Oct 2018; Data: 12 Nov 2018

Quantcast