Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Ippolito Capilupi

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Fano, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
8 Jul 1511Born
21 Jan 156048.5AppointedBishop of Fano, Italy
20 Jun 156048.9Ordained BishopBishop of Fano, Italy
1 Mar 156149.6AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Venice, Italy
10 Jun 156452.9ResignedApostolic Nuncio to Venice, Italy
1567¹55.4ResignedBishop of Fano, Italy
20 Apr 158068.7DiedBishop Emeritus of Fano, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Ippolito Capilupi (VIAF: 51679094)
Bishop Ippolito Capilupi (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Fano

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMantova
Ordained BishopRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}
Death PlaceRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

  • a bishop for 19.8 years

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 194
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 212, Number 17,559
  • nunc: Les Nonciatures Apostoliques Permanentes (Biaudet), Page 258
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1560, Number 7

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast