Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Alexandre de Bardi

Deceased

Bishop of Saint-Papoul


Events

DateEventTitle
19 Sep 1567AppointedBishop of Saint-Papoul, France
28 Sep 1567Ordained BishopBishop of Saint-Papoul, France
12 Sep 1591³DiedBishop of Saint-Papoul, France

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Alexandre de Bardi:
Bishop Alexandre de Bardi (died ) Bishop of Saint-Papoul

  • a bishop for 24.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 3, Page 270
  • ob/c2+: Sacres Episcopaux a Rome de 1565 a 1662, Page 12, Number 32

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013