Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop James Butler (1st)

Deceased

Archbishop of Cashel (-Emly)

Titular Bishop of Tlos


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1691¹Born
16 Nov 174958.8SelectedCoadjutor Archbishop of Cashel (-Emly), Ireland
16 Jan 175059.0ConfirmedCoadjutor Archbishop of Cashel (-Emly), Ireland
16 Jan 175059.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Tlos
May 1750²59.3Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Tlos
4 Sep 175766.6SucceededArchbishop of Cashel (-Emly), Ireland
17 May 177483.3DiedArchbishop of Cashel (-Emly), Ireland

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for James Butler (1st):
Archbishop James Butler (1st) (born 1691, died ) Archbishop of Cashel (-Emly)

  • a bishop for 24.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1750, Number 37
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 152, and Page 410

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.1.0, 17 Nov 2015; Data: 14 Dec 2015