Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Christopher Butler

Deceased

Archbishop of Cashel (-Emly), Ireland


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
18 Jan 1673Born
2 Mar 171138.1SelectedArchbishop of Cashel, Ireland
20 Aug 171138.5ConfirmedArchbishop of Cashel, Ireland
18 Oct 171138.7Ordained BishopArchbishop of Cashel, Ireland
4 Sep 175784.6DiedArchbishop of Cashel (-Emly), Ireland

MicroData Summary for Christopher Butler
Archbishop Christopher Butler (born , died ) Archbishop of Cashel (-Emly)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceGarryricken, Co. Kilkenny
Ordained BishopSt. Clement's, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy
Death PlaceWestcourt, Co. Kilkenny
Buried Place (Original)Family Vault, Kilcash

  • a bishop for 45.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 147
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1711, Number 23
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 60, Number 4,471
  • b: The Irish Catholic Episcopal Corps, 1657-1829, Volume 2, Page 14

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast