Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Karl Rudolf von Buol-Schauenstein

Deceased

Bishop of Chur-Sankt Gallen


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
30 Jun 1760BornInnsbruck
14 Jun 178323.0Ordained PriestPriest of Chur, Switzerland
22 Jan 179433.6SelectedBishop of Chur, Switzerland
12 Sep 179434.2ConfirmedBishop of Chur, Switzerland
5 Oct 179434.3Ordained BishopBishop of Chur, Switzerland
27 Sep 182464.2AppointedBishop of Chur-Sankt Gallen, Switzerland
23 Oct 183373.3DiedBishop of Chur-Sankt Gallen, Switzerland

MicroData Summary for Karl Rudolf von Buol-Schauenstein:
Bishop Karl Rudolf von Buol-Schauenstein (born , died ) Bishop of Chur-Sankt Gallen

  • a priest for 50.4 years
  • a bishop for 39.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 7, Page 201

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013