Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop John Brett, O.P. †

Deceased

Bishop of Elphin, Ireland


Events

DateEventTitle
8 Jul 1743SelectedBishop of Killala, Ireland
27 Jul 1743ConfirmedBishop of Killala, Ireland
8 Sep 1743Ordained BishopBishop of Killala, Ireland
28 Aug 1748AppointedBishop of Elphin, Ireland
22 Jun 1756DiedBishop of Elphin, Ireland

MicroData Summary for John Brett
Bishop John Brett O.P. (died ) Bishop of Elphin

  • a bishop for 12.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 77, and Page 207
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1743, Number 32

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018