Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Thomas Brentingham

Deceased

Bishop of Exeter, England, Great Britain


Events

DateEventTitle
4 Mar 1370AppointedBishop of Exeter, England, Great Britain
12 May 1370Ordained BishopBishop of Exeter, England, Great Britain
23 Dec 1394DiedBishop of Exeter, England, Great Britain

MicroData Summary for Thomas Brentingham
Bishop Thomas Brentingham (died ) Bishop of Exeter

  • a bishop for 24.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 243
  • ob/c2+: Registrum Sacrum Anglicanum, Page 80
  • b: Fasti Ecclesiae Anglicanae, Volume 1, Page 372

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast