Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Giberto Bartolomeo Cardinal Borromeo

Deceased

Bishop of Novara

Cardinal-Priest of Sant’Alessio


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 Sep 1671BornMilano
14 Dec 171039.2Ordained PriestPriest
26 Jan 171139.3AppointedTitular Patriarch of Antiochia {Antioch}
1 Mar 171139.4Ordained BishopTitular Patriarch of Antiochia {Antioch}
17 Jan 171442.3AppointedBishop of Novara, Italy
15 Mar 171745.5Elevated to Cardinal
10 May 171745.6InstalledCardinal-Priest of Sant’Alessio
22 Jan 174068.3DiedBishop of Novara, Italy

MicroData Summary for Giberto Bartolomeo Borromeo:
Giberto Bartolomeo Cardinal Borromeo (born , died ) Bishop of Novara

  • a priest for 29.1 years
  • a bishop for 28.8 years
  • a cardinal for 22.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 15 Mar 1717
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 89, and Page 293
  • c34: CB, 14 May 2013
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1711, Number 7

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 11 Nov 2015