Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Pietro Paolo Calorio (Calore), C.R.S. †

Deceased

Bishop of Krk (Veglia)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
17 Sep 1653BornVenice
19 Jul 167622.8Ordained PriestPriest of Clerks Regular of Somasca
26 Mar 170854.5AppointedBishop of Trogir (Tra¨), Croatia
2 Apr 1708³54.5Ordained BishopBishop of Trogir (Tra¨), Croatia
13 Feb 171359.4AppointedBishop of Krk (Veglia), Croatia
31 Jul 171763.8DiedBishop of Krk (Veglia), Croatia

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Pietro Paolo Calorio (Calore):
Bishop Pietro Paolo Calorio (Calore) C.R.S. (born , died ) Bishop of Krk (Veglia)

  • a priest for 41.0 years
  • a bishop for 9.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 384, and Page 406
  • b: Les Ordinations ╔piscopales, Year 1708, Number 29
  • ob/c2: AT, 18 Oct 2015

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 11 Nov 2015