Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jerolim Blaž Bonačić

Deceased

Bishop of Šibenik (Knin)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
3 Feb 1709BornMilna
29 Mar 173223.1Ordained PriestPriest
13 Jul 175950.4AppointedBishop of Šibenik (Knin), Croatia
25 Jul 175950.4Ordained BishopBishop of Šibenik (Knin), Croatia
20 Sep 176253.6DiedBishop of Šibenik (Knin), Croatia

MicroData Summary for Jerolim Blaž Bonačić:
Bishop Jerolim Blaž Bonačić (born , died ) Bishop of Šibenik (Knin)

  • a priest for 30.4 years
  • a bishop for 3.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 379
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1759, Number 26

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.1.0, 17 Nov 2015; Data: 23 Nov 2015