Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Joannes Bocheński

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Lviv (Ukrainian)

Titular Bishop of Rhosus

Titular See: auxb/Leopolien, Halicien, et Camenecen (Rutheni)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1783¹BornGrasbenec
1815¹32.0Ordained PriestPriest
20 May 185067.4AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Lviv (Ukrainian), Ukraine
20 May 185067.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Rhosus
13 Oct 185067.8Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Rhosus
25 Jan 185774.1DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Lviv (Ukrainian), Ukraine

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Joannes Bocheński:
Bishop Joannes Bocheński (died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Lviv

  • a priest for 42.1 years
  • a bishop for 6.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 482

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013