Catholic-Hierarchy DC

St. Bonaventura (Giovanni) Cardinal , O.F.M. †

Deceased

Cardinal-Bishop of Albano


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1217BornBagnoregio, Italy
124326.0ProfessedMember of Order of Friars Minor
2 Feb 125740.0SelectedMinister General of Order of Friars Minor
3 Jun 127356.4AppointedCardinal-Bishop of Albano
3 Jun 127356.4Elevated to Cardinal
11 Nov 127356.8Ordained BishopCardinal-Bishop of Albano
15 Jul 127457.5DiedCardinal-Bishop of Albano
14 Apr 1482Canonized

MicroData Summary for St. Bonaventura (Giovanni) :
St. Bonaventura (Giovanni) Cardinal O.F.M. (died ) Cardinal-Bishop of Albano

  • a bishop for .6 years
  • a cardinal for 1.1 years

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 3 Jun 1273

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015