Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop José Francisco Bermúdez Mandía

Deceased

Bishop of Astorga


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
28 Aug 1673³BornLa Coruña
15 Nov 172855.2AppointedBishop of Astorga, Spain
6 Feb 172955.4Ordained BishopBishop of Astorga, Spain
3 Mar 173662.5DiedBishop of Astorga, Spain

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for José Francisco Bermúdez Mandía:
Bishop José Francisco Bermúdez Mandía (born , died ) Bishop of Astorga

  • a bishop for 7.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1700, Page 47, Number 188
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1729, Number 3
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 103

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 11 Nov 2015