Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Tomás Belestá y Cambeses

Deceased

Bishop of Zamora, Spain


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
29 Dec 1811Born
22 Sep 188068.7SelectedBishop of Zamora, Spain
16 Dec 188068.9ConfirmedBishop of Zamora, Spain
6 Mar 188169.1Ordained BishopBishop of Zamora, Spain
6 Apr 189280.2DiedBishop of Zamora, Spain

MicroData Summary for Tomás Belestá y Cambeses
Bishop Tomás Belestá y Cambeses (born , died ) Bishop of Zamora

EventPlace
Birth PlaceZamora, Diocese of Zamora
Ordained BishopSan Antonio, Madrid, Archdiocese of Toledo

  • a bishop for 11.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 601
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1881, Number 11

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 24 May 2017