Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Miguel Bayot, O.F.M. Disc. †

Deceased

Bishop of Cebu, Philippines


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
10 Jul 1644³Born
13 May 169752.8AppointedBishop of Cebu, Philippines
21 Sep 169955.1Ordained BishopBishop of Cebu, Philippines
28 Aug 170056.1DiedBishop of Cebu, Philippines

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Miguel Bayot
Bishop Miguel Bayot O.F.M. Disc. (born , died ) Bishop of Cebu

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBelmonte, Spain

  • a bishop for .9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: CB
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1500, Page 241, Number 1,494
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1699, Number 19
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 291

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast