Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Francesco Maria Barzellotti

Deceased

Bishop of Sovana e Pitigliano, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
21 Jan 1782Born
19 Sep 180725.6Ordained PriestPriest
2 Jul 183250.4AppointedBishop of Sovana (Soana), Italy
8 Jul 183250.4Ordained BishopBishop of Sovana (Soana), Italy
15 Aug 186179.5DiedBishop of Sovana e Pitigliano, Italy

MicroData Summary for Francesco Maria Barzellotti (VIAF: 315182251)
Bishop Francesco Maria Barzellotti (born , died ) Bishop of Sovana e Pitigliano

EventPlace
Birth PlacePiancastagnaio

  • a priest for 53.9 years
  • a bishop for 29.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1857
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 349
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1832, Number 32

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast