Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Wojciech Ignacy Bardziński

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Włocławek (Kujawy, Kalisze), Poland

Titular Bishop of Sarepta


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1648¹Born
28 Jan 170961.0AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Włocławek (Kujawy, Kalisze), Poland
28 Jan 170961.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Sarepta
28 Jul 170961.5Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Sarepta
9 Feb 172375.1DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Włocławek (Kujawy, Kalisze), Poland

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Wojciech Ignacy Bardziński
Bishop Wojciech Ignacy Bardziński (born 1648, died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Włocławek (Kujawy, Kalisze)

EventPlace
Ordained BishopTroppau

  • a bishop for 13.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 345
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 153, Number 13,410
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1709, Number 12
  • ob/c2+: CB, 27 Jan 2020

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast