Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jan Kuczborski

Deceased

Bishop of Chelmno (Culma, Kulm)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1572¹Born
28 Apr 161442.3AppointedBishop of Chelmno (Culma, Kulm), Poland
30 Nov 161442.9Ordained BishopBishop of Chelmno (Culma, Kulm), Poland
31 Mar 162452.2DiedBishop of Chelmno (Culma, Kulm), Poland

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Jan Kuczborski:
Bishop Jan Kuczborski (died ) Bishop of Chelmno (Culma, Kulm)

  • a bishop for 9.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013