Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Andrés Cabrera Bobadilla

Deceased

Archbishop of Zaragoza


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1544²BornSegovia
8 Nov 158238.8AppointedBishop of Segovia, Spain
6 Feb 158339.0Ordained BishopBishop of Segovia, Spain
13 Oct 158642.7AppointedArchbishop of Zaragoza, Spain
25 Aug 159248.6DiedArchbishop of Zaragoza, Spain

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Andrés Cabrera Bobadilla:
Archbishop Andrés Cabrera Bobadilla (died ) Archbishop of Zaragoza

  • a bishop for 9.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 296, and Page 144
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1500, Page 94, Number 590

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015