Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Lorenzo Astiria, O.S.Io.Hieros. †

Deceased

Bishop of Malta


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1604²BornTarazona, Spain
22 Apr 162824.3Ordained PriestPriest of Sovereign Military Hospitaller Order of St John of Jerusalem
16 Jun 167066.5AppointedBishop of Malta
6 Jul 167066.5Ordained BishopBishop of Malta
5 Jan 167874.0DiedBishop of Malta

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Lorenzo Astiria:
Bishop Lorenzo Astiria O.S.Io.Hieros. (died ) Bishop of Malta

  • a priest for 49.7 years
  • a bishop for 7.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 5, Page 264
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1500, Page 206, Number 1,286

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.3, 27 Sep 2013; data: 4 Nov 2013