Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Luigi Antonio Arrighi de Casanova

Deceased

Bishop of Acqui, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
11 Apr 1755Born
7 May 180752.0SelectedBishop of Acqui, Italy
3 Aug 180752.3ConfirmedBishop of Acqui, Italy
13 Dec 180752.6Ordained BishopBishop of Acqui, Italy
29 Dec 180954.7DiedBishop of Acqui, Italy

MicroData Summary for Luigi Antonio Arrighi de Casanova
Bishop Luigi Antonio Arrighi de Casanova (born , died ) Bishop of Acqui

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCorte

  • a bishop for 2.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1,807, Number 21
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 84

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast