Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Juan Aparicio Navarro

Deceased

Bishop of León


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
8 Jan 1624BornBrías
1652²28.0Ordained PriestPriest
27 Nov 167349.9AppointedBishop of Lugo, Spain
3 Jun 167450.4Ordained BishopBishop of Lugo, Spain
7 Oct 168056.7AppointedBishop of León, Spain
6 Nov 169672.8DiedBishop of León, Spain

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Juan Aparicio Navarro:
Bishop Juan Aparicio Navarro (born , died ) Bishop of León

  • a priest for 44.8 years
  • a bishop for 22.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 5, Page 240, and Page 247
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1500, Page 211, Number 1,317

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.3, 27 Sep 2013; data: 30 Oct 2013