Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Anton Ludovico Antinori, C.O. †

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Acerenza e Matera


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
26 Aug 1704BornL'Aquila
19 Dec 173935.3Ordained PriestPriest of Confederation of Oratorians of St. Philip Neri
20 May 174540.7SelectedArchbishop of Lanciano, Italy
21 Jun 174540.8ConfirmedArchbishop of Lanciano, Italy
27 Jun 174540.8Ordained BishopArchbishop of Lanciano, Italy
28 Mar 175449.5SelectedArchbishop of Acerenza e Matera, Italy
22 Apr 175449.6ConfirmedArchbishop of Acerenza e Matera, Italy
24 Apr 175853.6ResignedArchbishop of Acerenza e Matera, Italy
1 Mar 177873.5DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Acerenza e Matera, Italy

MicroData Summary for Anton Ludovico Antinori:
Archbishop Anton Ludovico Antinori C.O. (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Acerenza e Matera

  • a priest for 38.2 years
  • a bishop for 32.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 64, and Page 251

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015