Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Bl. Giovanni Giovenale Ancina, C.O. †

Deceased

Bishop of Saluzzo


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
19 Oct 1545BornFossano
7 Oct 158034.9ProfessedMember of Confederation of Oratorians of St. Philip Neri
9 Jun 158236.6Ordained PriestPriest of Confederation of Oratorians of St. Philip Neri
26 Aug 160256.8AppointedBishop of Saluzzo, Italy
1 Sep 160256.8Ordained BishopBishop of Saluzzo, Italy
29 Aug 160458.8DiedBishop of Saluzzo, Italy
9 Feb 1889Beatified

MicroData Summary for Bl. Giovanni Giovenale Ancina:
Bishop Bl. Giovanni Giovenale Ancina C.O. (born , died ) Bishop of Saluzzo

  • a priest for 22.2 years
  • a bishop for 1.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 302
  • ob/c2+: Sacres Episcopaux a Rome de 1565 a 1662, Page 38, Number 199
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1602, Number 19

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 4 Feb 2015